PA SB381 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on June 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-27 - Act No. 30
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on June 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-27 - Act No. 30
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Titles 13 (Commercial Code), 30 (Fish) and 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, revising secured transaction provisions relating to definitions, to control of electronic chattel paper, to location of debtor, to perfection of security interests in property subject to certain statutes, regulations and treaties, to continued perfection of security interest following change in governing law, to interests which take priority over or take free of security interest or agricultural lien, to priority of security interests created by new debtor, to discharge of account debtor, notification of assignment, identification and proof of assignment, restrictions on assignment of accounts, chattel paper, payment intangibles and promissory notes ineffective, to restrictions on assignment of promissory notes, health-care-insurance receivables and certain general intangibles ineffective, to contents of financing statement, record of mortgage as financing statement, time of filing financing statement, to name of debtor and secured party, to effect of certain events on effectiveness of financing statement, to duration and effectiveness of financing statement, effect of lapsed financing statement, to what constitutes filing, effectiveness of filing, to claim concerning inaccurate or wrongfully filed record and to collection and enforcement by secured party; providing for transition provisions for 2013 amendments; imposing duties upon the Department of State and the Department of Transportation; and making editorial changes.
Title
Revising secured transaction provisions relating to definitions, to control of electronic chattel paper, to location of debtor, to perfection of security interests in property subject to certain statutes, regulations and treaties, to continued perfection of security interest following change in governing law, to interests which take priority over or take free of security interest or agricultural lien, to priority of security interests created by new debtor, to discharge of account debtor, notification of assignment, identification and proof of assignment, restrictions on assignment of accounts, chattel paper, payment intangibles and promissory notes ineffective, to restrictions on assignment of promissory notes, health-care-insurance receivables and certain general intangibles ineffective, to contents of financing statement, record of mortgage as financing statement, time of filing financing statement, to name of debtor and secured party, to effect of certain events on effectiveness of financing statement, to duration and effectiveness of financing statement, effect of lapsed financing statement, to what constitutes filing, effectiveness of filing, to claim concerning inaccurate or wrongfully filed record and to collection and enforcement by secured party; providing for transition provisions for 2013 amendments; imposing duties upon the Department of State and the Department of Transportation; and making editorial changes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-24 - House - SB 381 PN 314, FP (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-04-15 - Senate - SB 381 PN 314, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-08 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-15 - Senate - SB 381 PN 314, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-08 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-27 | House | Act No. 30 |
2013-06-27 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2013-06-26 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2013-06-25 | House | Signed in House |
2013-06-25 | House | Signed in Senate |
2013-06-24 | House | Third consideration and final passage (198-0) |
2013-06-24 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2013-06-20 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-06-20 | House | Second consideration |
2013-06-19 | House | Removed from table |
2013-06-18 | House | Laid on the table |
2013-06-18 | House | First consideration |
2013-06-18 | House | Reported as committed |
2013-04-17 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2013-04-15 | House | In the House |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Second consideration |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-02-05 | Senate | First consideration |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2013-02-01 | Senate | Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE |