PA SB383 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-10 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-10 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 3, 1937 (P.L.1333, No.320), known as the Pennsylvania Election Code, in primary and election expenses, further providing for contributions by agents, anonymous contributions and cash contributions.
Title
In primary and election expenses, further providing for contributions by agents, anonymous contributions and cash contributions.
Sponsors
Sen. Amanda Cappelletti [D] | Sen. Timothy Kearney [D] | Sen. Arthur Haywood [D] | Sen. John Kane [D] |
Sen. Wayne Fontana [D] | Sen. Judy Schwank [D] | Sen. Steven Santarsiero [D] | Sen. Katie Muth [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-09 - Senate - Senate State Government: Adopt Amendment A00505 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-10 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Second consideration |
2023-05-09 | Senate | First consideration |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |