PA SB471 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Introduced on March 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-08 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-08 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 4, 1971 (P.L.6, No.2), known as the Tax Reform Code of 1971, in Computer Data Center Equipment Incentive Program, further providing for definitions and providing for applicability and for sales and use tax exemption; and making editorial changes.
Title
In Computer Data Center Equipment Incentive Program, further providing for definitions and providing for applicability and for sales and use tax exemption; and making editorial changes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Finance: Reported as Committed (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-08 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-03-27 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Referred to FINANCE |