PA SB476 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on October 8 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-10-14 - Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY
Pending: House Labor And Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 8 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-10-14 - Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY
Pending: House Labor And Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act establishing guidelines and procedures governing certain investigations of correctional officers; authorizing certain civil suits by correctional officers; and providing for impact of collective bargaining agreements and for summary suspensions.
Title
Establishing guidelines and procedures governing certain investigations of correctional officers; authorizing certain civil suits by correctional officers; and providing for impact of collective bargaining agreements and for summary suspensions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-10-06 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-14 | House | Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY |
2014-10-08 | House | In the House |
2014-10-08 | Senate | Final passage (48-2) |
2014-10-08 | Senate | Vote on final passage reconsidered |
2014-10-08 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-1) |
2014-10-07 | Senate | Second consideration |
2014-10-06 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2014-06-29 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-06-24 | Senate | First consideration |
2014-06-24 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY |