PA SB502 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-10-11 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-10-11 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 23 (Domestic Relations) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in protection from abuse, further providing for relief.
Title
In protection from abuse, further providing for relief.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-10-09 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A09049 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-09 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 502 PN 1552, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-09 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 502 PN 1552, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-11 | House | Removed from table |
2018-10-09 | House | Laid on the table |
2018-10-09 | House | First consideration |
2018-10-09 | House | Reported as amended |
2018-03-26 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2018-03-21 | House | In the House |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Second consideration |
2018-03-19 | Senate | First consideration |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |