PA SB538 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-04 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-04 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act authorizing the Department of General Services, with the approval of Shippensburg University of Pennsylvania of the State System of Higher Education and the Governor, to grant and convey to the Cumberland Valley Rails to Trails Council a permanent easement from lands of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania at Shippensburg University of Pennsylvania situate in Shippensburg Township, Cumberland County, for the purpose of establishing and maintaining a parking lot for the benefit of the general public utilizing the Cumberland Valley Rail Trail.
Title
Authorizing the Department of General Services, with the approval of Shippensburg University of Pennsylvania of the State System of Higher Education and the Governor, to grant and convey to the Cumberland Valley Rails to Trails Council a permanent easement from lands of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania at Shippensburg University of Pennsylvania situate in Shippensburg Township, Cumberland County, for the purpose of establishing and maintaining a parking lot for the benefit of the general public utilizing the Cumberland Valley Rail Trail.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 538 PN 731, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-04 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2019-06-03 | House | In the House |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-0) |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-05-07 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |