PA SB61 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-25 - Referred to LIQUOR CONTROL
Pending: House Liquor Control Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-25 - Referred to LIQUOR CONTROL
Pending: House Liquor Control Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 12, 1951 (P.L.90, No.21), known as the Liquor Code, in preliminary provisions, further providing for the definition of "eligible entity"; and, in licenses and regulations and liquor, alcohol and malt and brewed beverages, further providing for wine and spirits auction permits.
Title
In preliminary provisions, further providing for the definition of "eligible entity"; and, in licenses and regulations and liquor, alcohol and malt and brewed beverages, further providing for wine and spirits auction permits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-10-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 61 PN 1294, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 61 PN 1006, A2752, WARD, JUDY AMENDMENT NO. A-2752 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Law And Justice: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 61 PN 1006, A2752, WARD, JUDY AMENDMENT NO. A-2752 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Law And Justice: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-25 | House | Referred to LIQUOR CONTROL |
2019-10-23 | House | In the House |
2019-10-23 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-0) |
2019-10-22 | Senate | Amended on third consideration (49-0) |
2019-10-21 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-06-18 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Referred to LAW AND JUSTICE |