PA SB668 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-14 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-14 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of August 26, 1971 (P.L.351, No.91), known as the State Lottery Law, in pharmaceutical assistance for the elderly, further providing for the Pharmaceutical Assistance Contract for the Elderly Needs Enhancement Tier, for powers of the department and for coordination of benefits.
Title
In pharmaceutical assistance for the elderly, further providing for the Pharmaceutical Assistance Contract for the Elderly Needs Enhancement Tier, for powers of the department and for coordination of benefits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-09-28 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 668 PN 756, Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Aging And Youth: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 668 PN 756, Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Aging And Youth: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-14 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-12-14 | House | Removed from table |
2021-09-28 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-09-28 | House | First consideration |
2021-09-28 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-06-23 | House | Referred to AGING AND OLDER ADULT SERVICES |
2021-06-22 | House | In the House |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Second consideration |
2021-06-08 | Senate | First consideration |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Referred to AGING AND YOUTH |