PA SB68 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-20 - Referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-20 - Referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Supplement to the act of May 29, 2020 (P.L. , No.1A), known as the General Appropriation Act of 2020, further providing for additional appropriations from the General Fund for the expenses of the Executive Department for the fiscal year July 1, 2020, to June 30, 2021.
Title
A Supplement to the act of May 29, 2020 (P.L. , No.1A), known as the General Appropriation Act of 2020, further providing for additional appropriations from the General Fund for the expenses of the Executive Department for the fiscal year July 1, 2020, to June 30, 2021.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-20 | Senate | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |