PA SB693 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-09 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-09 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 3, 1937 (P.L.1333, No.320), known as the Pennsylvania Election Code, in ballots, further providing for form of ballots, printing ballots, stubs and numbers; in voting machines, further providing for form of ballot labels on voting machines; and, in electronic voting systems, further providing for forms.
Title
In ballots, further providing for form of ballots, printing ballots, stubs and numbers; in voting machines, further providing for form of ballot labels on voting machines; and, in electronic voting systems, further providing for forms.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-10-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 21 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-09 | Senate | Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9) |
2020-04-20 | Senate | Removed from table |
2020-04-20 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Removed from table |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2019-10-21 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-06-18 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |