PA SB750 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-4)
Status: Passed on December 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-27 - Act No. 118
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-4)
Status: Passed on December 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-27 - Act No. 118
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.177, No.175), known as The Administrative Code of 1929, in powers and duties of the Department of General Services and its departmental administrative and advisory boards and commissions, further providing for grounds, buildings and monuments in general and providing for transfer the authority of Lieutenant Governor's Mansion; and making a related repeal.
Title
In powers and duties of the Department of General Services and its departmental administrative and advisory boards and commissions, further providing for grounds, buildings and monuments in general and providing for transfer the authority of Lieutenant Governor's Mansion; and making a related repeal.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-12-18 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-18 - House - House Floor: SB 750 PN 1188, FP (Y: 176 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-11-19 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 750 PN 1188, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-24 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-18 - House - House Floor: SB 750 PN 1188, FP (Y: 176 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-11-19 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 750 PN 1188, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-24 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-27 | House | Act No. 118 |
2019-12-27 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2019-12-18 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2019-12-18 | House | Signed in House |
2019-12-18 | House | Signed in Senate |
2019-12-18 | House | Third consideration and final passage (176-21) |
2019-12-18 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-12-17 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-12-17 | House | Second consideration |
2019-12-16 | House | Removed from table |
2019-11-19 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-11-19 | House | First consideration |
2019-11-19 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-10-25 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2019-10-23 | House | In the House |
2019-10-23 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-0) |
2019-10-21 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2019-09-25 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-09-25 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-09-24 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-09-24 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |