PA SB773 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-20 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-20 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in general provisions, further providing for definitions; in licensing of drivers, further providing for suspension of operating privilege, for the offense of driving while operating privilege is suspended or revoked and for ignition interlock limited license and providing for relief from Administrative Suspension Program; in commercial drivers, further providing for definitions; and, in driving after imbibing alcohol or utilizing drugs, further providing for driving under influence of alcohol or controlled substance, for grading, for penalties, for ignition interlock, for prior offenses, for Accelerated Rehabilitative Disposition, for authorized use not a defense, for drug and alcohol assessments and for mandatory sentencing and providing for substance monitoring program.
Title
In general provisions, further providing for definitions; in licensing of drivers, further providing for suspension of operating privilege, for the offense of driving while operating privilege is suspended or revoked and for ignition interlock limited license and providing for relief from Administrative Suspension Program; in commercial drivers, further providing for definitions; and, in driving after imbibing alcohol or utilizing drugs, further providing for driving under influence of alcohol or controlled substance, for grading, for penalties, for ignition interlock, for prior offenses, for Accelerated Rehabilitative Disposition, for authorized use not a defense, for drug and alcohol assessments and for mandatory sentencing and providing for substance monitoring program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-10-20 - House - House Floor: SB 773 PN 1771, 2019 A6303, CARROLL (Y: 109 N: 93 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-20 - House - House Floor: SB 773 PN 1771, 2019 A7729, CARROLL (Y: 179 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-20 - House - House Floor: SB 773 PN 1771, 2019 A6317, WHEATLEY (Y: 129 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-20 - House - House Floor: SB 773 PN 1771, 2019 A7663, KLUNK (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A06127 (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 20 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 773 PN 1468, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 43 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-21 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-20 - House - House Floor: SB 773 PN 1771, 2019 A7729, CARROLL (Y: 179 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-20 - House - House Floor: SB 773 PN 1771, 2019 A6317, WHEATLEY (Y: 129 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-20 - House - House Floor: SB 773 PN 1771, 2019 A7663, KLUNK (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A06127 (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 20 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 773 PN 1468, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 43 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-21 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-20 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-10-20 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2020-09-16 | House | Removed from table |
2020-09-16 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-06-15 | House | Removed from table |
2020-06-10 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-06-10 | House | First consideration |
2020-06-10 | House | Reported as amended |
2020-01-30 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2020-01-28 | House | In the House |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (43-6) |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Second consideration, with amendments |
2019-11-21 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-11-21 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2019-08-28 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |