PA SB775 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-24 - Act No. 67
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-24 - Act No. 67
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 11 (Cities) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, consolidating The Third Class City Code; making revisions concerning records of ordinances maintained by the city clerk, bond, insurance and salary, qualifications for office of city treasurer, committee preparation of uniform financial report forms, observances, celebrations and recognition, selection of appointee from certified list of applicants and support of Pennsylvania National Guard units; making an editorial change; and making a related repeal.
Title
Consolidating The Third Class City Code; making revisions concerning records of ordinances maintained by the city clerk, bond, insurance and salary, qualifications for office of city treasurer, committee preparation of uniform financial report forms, observances, celebrations and recognition, selection of appointee from certified list of applicants and support of Pennsylvania National Guard units; making an editorial change; and making a related repeal.
Sponsors
Sen. John Eichelberger [R] | Sen. Scott Hutchinson [R] | Sen. Thomas McGarrigle [R] | Sen. John Wozniak [D] |
Sen. John Blake [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-11-10 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-10 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-10 - House - House Floor: SB 775 PN 834, FP (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-10-28 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-28 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 775 PN 834, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-10 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-10 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-10 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-10 - House - House Floor: SB 775 PN 834, FP (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-10-28 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-28 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 775 PN 834, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-10 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-10 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-24 | House | Act No. 67 |
2015-11-24 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2015-11-17 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2015-11-16 | House | Signed in House |
2015-11-16 | House | Signed in Senate |
2015-11-10 | House | Third consideration and final passage (193-0) |
2015-11-10 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2015-11-09 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-11-09 | House | Second consideration |
2015-11-05 | House | Removed from table |
2015-10-28 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-10-28 | House | First consideration |
2015-10-28 | House | Reported as committed |
2015-06-25 | House | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2015-06-23 | House | In the House |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2015-06-17 | Senate | Second consideration |
2015-06-10 | Senate | First consideration |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2015-05-01 | Senate | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |