PA SB816 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-7)
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-10 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-10 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of November 24, 1998 (P.L.882, No.111), known as the Crime Victims Act, further providing for the Office of Victim Advocate and for powers and duties of victim advocate.
Title
Further providing for the Office of Victim Advocate and for powers and duties of victim advocate.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-08 - Senate - SB 816 PN 834, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-23 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-23 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-10 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2011-06-08 | House | In the House |
2011-06-08 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2011-06-06 | Senate | Second consideration |
2011-05-23 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2011-05-04 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2011-04-12 | Senate | First consideration |
2011-04-12 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2011-03-11 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |