PA SB824 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Engrossed on October 4 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-10-04 - Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION, TECHNOLOGY AND UTILITIES
Pending: House Consumer Protection, Technology and Utilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 4 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-10-04 - Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION, TECHNOLOGY AND UTILITIES
Pending: House Consumer Protection, Technology and Utilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of December 22, 2005 (P.L.474, No.94), known as the Breach of Personal Information Notification Act, further providing for definitions, for notification of the breach of the security of the system and for notification of consumer reporting agencies; and providing for credit reporting and monitoring.
Title
Further providing for definitions, for notification of the breach of the security of the system and for notification of consumer reporting agencies; and providing for credit reporting and monitoring.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-10-04 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 824 PN 1151, Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-02 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-19 - Senate - Senate Communications And Technology: Adopt Amendment A02020 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-19 - Senate - Senate Communications And Technology: Adopt Amendment A01100 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-19 - Senate - Senate Communications And Technology: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-02 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-19 - Senate - Senate Communications And Technology: Adopt Amendment A02020 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-19 - Senate - Senate Communications And Technology: Adopt Amendment A01100 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-19 - Senate - Senate Communications And Technology: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-04 | House | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION, TECHNOLOGY AND UTILITIES |
2023-10-04 | House | In the House |
2023-10-04 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2023-10-03 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2023-10-02 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2023-09-20 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2023-09-20 | Senate | Second consideration |
2023-09-19 | Senate | First consideration |
2023-09-19 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Referred to COMMUNICATIONS AND TECHNOLOGY |