PA SB832 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on June 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-05 - Re-reported as committed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-05 - Re-reported as committed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 71 (State Government) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in boards and offices, establishing the Independent Energy Office.
Title
In boards and offices, establishing the Independent Energy Office.
Sponsors
Sen. Gene Yaw [R] | Sen. Daniel Laughlin [R] | Sen. Wayne Langerholc [R] | Sen. Ryan Aument [R] |
Sen. Elder Vogel [R] | Sen. Lynda Schlegel Culver [R] | Sen. Lisa Baker [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-12 - Senate - Senate Environmental Resources And Energy: Adopt Amendment A03299 (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-12 - Senate - Senate Environmental Resources And Energy: Reported as Amended (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-12 - Senate - Senate Environmental Resources And Energy: Adopt Amendment A03299 (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-12 - Senate - Senate Environmental Resources And Energy: Reported as Amended (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-05 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2023-12-13 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2023-12-13 | Senate | Second consideration |
2023-12-12 | Senate | First consideration |
2023-12-12 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2023-06-20 | Senate | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |