PA SB887 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on December 11 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-12-12 - Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 11 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-12-12 - Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 9 (Burial Grounds) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in regulation of cemetery companies, further providing for initial deposits by newly-organized cemetery companies and for registration and filing affidavit of compliance.
Title
In regulation of cemetery companies, further providing for initial deposits by newly-organized cemetery companies and for registration and filing affidavit of compliance.
Sponsors
Sen. Scott Hutchinson [R] | Sen. Cris Dush [R] | Sen. Rosemary Brown [R] | Sen. Timothy Kearney [D] |
Sen. Carolyn Comitta [D] | Sen. Steven Santarsiero [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-12-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 887 PN 1053, Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-11-13 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-04 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-11-13 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-04 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-12 | House | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2023-12-11 | House | In the House |
2023-12-11 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-0) |
2023-11-13 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2023-10-16 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2023-10-16 | Senate | Second consideration |
2023-10-04 | Senate | First consideration |
2023-10-04 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2023-08-23 | Senate | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |