PA SB894 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Introduced on June 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-07-13 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-07-13 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act designating the bridge on that portion of State Route 940 over Tobyhanna Creek (Pocono Lake) in Tobyhanna Township, Monroe County, as the Sullivan Bridge.
Title
Designating the bridge on that portion of State Route 940 over Tobyhanna Creek (Pocono Lake) in Tobyhanna Township, Monroe County, as the Sullivan Bridge.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-16 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-13 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Second consideration |
2015-06-16 | Senate | First consideration |
2015-06-16 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2015-06-12 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |