PA SB915 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Passed on October 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-24 - Act No. 146
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Passed on October 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-24 - Act No. 146
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, providing for victim and witness outreach; and, in post-trial matters, further providing for eligibility for relief and for jurisdiction and proceedings.
Title
Providing for victim and witness outreach; and, in post-trial matters, further providing for eligibility for relief and for jurisdiction and proceedings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-10-17 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 915 PN 2085, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-16 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-16 - House - House Floor: SB 915 PN 2085, FP (Y: 190 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-10-09 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A09890 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-09 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 915 PN 1534, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 915 PN 2085, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-16 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-16 - House - House Floor: SB 915 PN 2085, FP (Y: 190 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-10-09 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A09890 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-09 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 915 PN 1534, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-24 | Senate | Act No. 146 |
2018-10-24 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2018-10-18 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2018-10-17 | Senate | Signed in House |
2018-10-17 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2018-10-17 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments (49-0) |
2018-10-17 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2018-10-16 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2018-10-16 | Senate | In the Senate |
2018-10-16 | House | Third consideration and final passage (190-0) |
2018-10-16 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2018-10-15 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-10-15 | House | Second consideration |
2018-10-11 | House | Removed from table |
2018-10-09 | House | Laid on the table |
2018-10-09 | House | First consideration |
2018-10-09 | House | Reported as amended |
2018-04-19 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2018-04-17 | House | In the House |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Second consideration |
2018-03-19 | Senate | First consideration |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |