PA SR46 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-06 - Transmitted as directed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-06 - Transmitted as directed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution directing the Joint State Government Commission to establish the Task Force on Women Veterans' Health Care.
Title
Directing the Joint State Government Commission to establish the Task Force on Women Veterans' Health Care.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: SR 46 PN 903 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-06-19 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Adopt Amendment A01042 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-19 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-19 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Adopt Amendment A01042 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-19 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-06 | Senate | Transmitted as directed |
2023-06-22 | Senate | Adopted (48-0) |
2023-06-19 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |