RI H5236 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House State Government & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House State Government & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution To Approve And Publish And Submit To The Electors A Proposition Of Amendment To The Constitution Of The State (initiative And Referendum) (this Resolution Would Enable The Citizens Of Rhode Island To Propose Laws And Amendments To The Constitution Through An Initiative And Referendum Process, Except As To Revenue And Appropriations, Which Power Remains Vested In The General Assembly.)
Title
Joint Resolution To Approve And Publish And Submit To The Electors A Proposition Of Amendment To The Constitution Of The State (initiative And Referendum) (this Resolution Would Enable The Citizens Of Rhode Island To Propose Laws And Amendments To The Constitution Through An Initiative And Referendum Process, Except As To Revenue And Appropriations, Which Power Remains Vested In The General Assembly.)
Sponsors
Rep. Ramon Perez [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-01 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-02-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/01/2023) |
2023-01-25 | House | Introduced, referred to House State Government & Elections |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText23/HouseText23/H5236.pdf |