RI H5253 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-08 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-08 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Removes the prohibition of the town of Barrington from issuing Class A licenses.
Title
Licenses Generally
Sponsors
Rep. Joy Hearn [D] | Rep. Jan Malik [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-01 - House - Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-08 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2015-04-30 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (04/30/2015) |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/15/2015) |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |
2015-04-01 | House | House read and passed |
2015-03-26 | House | Placed on House Calendar (04/01/2015) |
2015-03-19 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2015-03-13 | House | Scheduled for consideration (03/19/2015) |
2015-02-26 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-02-23 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/26/2015) |
2015-01-29 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government |