RI H5397 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts a housing development financed with federal low income tax credits, as well as Rhode Island non-profit corporations or entities which are tax exempt and own real estate under an affordable housing program, from real estate conveyance tax.
Title
Real Estate Conveyance Tax
Sponsors
Rep. Katherine Kazarian [D] | Rep. Scott Slater [D] | Rep. William O'Brien [D] | Rep. Julie Casimiro [D] |
Rep. Karen Alzate [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-28 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-05-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/28/2019) |
2019-02-14 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5397.pdf |