RI H5440 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-09 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-09 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Education - School And Youth Programs Concussion Act: would establish further safeguards and procedures governing how to treat youth athletes who receive concussions
Title
An Act Relating To Education - School And Youth Programs Concussion Act
Sponsors
Rep. John Edwards [D] | Rep. Raymond Gallison [D] | Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] | Rep. Richard Morrison [D] |
Rep. Patricia Serpa [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-09 | Signed by Governor | |
2011-07-07 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-06-30 | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence | |
2011-06-30 | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar | |
2011-06-29 | House passed Sub A | |
2011-06-27 | Placed on House Calendar | |
2011-06-27 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A | |
2011-06-27 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2011-03-16 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2011-03-16 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2011-02-16 | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://dirac.rilin.state.ri.us/BillStatus/WebClass1.ASP?WCI=BillStatus&WCE=ifrmBillStatus&WCU |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText11/HouseText11/H5440.pdf |