RI H5440 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Distinguishes the criminal penalties for violations of final order of contractors' registration board based on the amount of the monetary amount on the final orders with orders in excess of $5,000 deemed felonies and less than $5,000 deemed misdemeanors.
Title
Contractors' Registration And Licensing Board
Sponsors
Rep. Dennis Canario [D] | Rep. Joseph Solomon [D] | Rep. John Edwards [D] | Rep. Jeremiah O'Grady [D] |
Rep. Anastasia Williams [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-28 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-02-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/28/2017) |
2017-02-09 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H5440.pdf |