RI H5517 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-24 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-24 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits cost sharing for persons forty-five (45) years or older for colorectal screening examinations, laboratory tests and colonoscopies covered by health insurance policies.
Title
Accident And Sickness Insurance Policies
Sponsors
Rep. Mia Ackerman [D] | Rep. Joseph Shekarchi [D] | Rep. Sherry Roberts [R] | Rep. Grace Diaz [D] |
Rep. Brian Kennedy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-04-22 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/24/2019) |
2019-04-10 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (04/10/2019) |
2019-04-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2019-02-15 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5517.pdf |