RI H5599 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-31 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-31 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires all health care insurance companies to give 60 days' notice to all authorized prescribers, network pharmacies, pharmacists and affected subscribers when they remove a prescription drug from its plan' formulary.
Title
Drug Coverage
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-31 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-03-27 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/31/2015) |
2015-02-25 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText15/HouseText15/H5599.pdf |