RI H5599 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-16 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-16 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires that alternate applicants for the Rhode Island state police training academy be ranked according to objective qualification standards and selected to fill vacancies according to that ranking.
Title
State Police
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-16 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-03-10 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/16/2017) |
2017-03-01 | House | Introduced, referred to House Labor |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H5599.pdf |