RI H5605 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-07 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-07 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that the students with disabilities shall be eligible to participate in the state's promise scholarship program and provided with reasonable accommodations to access the opportunities.
Title
Rhode Island Promise Scholarship
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Chippendale [R] | Rep. Blake Filippi [R] | Rep. Brian Newberry [R] | Rep. George Nardone [R] |
Rep. David Place [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-07 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-04-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/07/2021) |
2021-02-15 | House | Introduced, referred to House Education |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H5605.pdf |