RI H5764 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-16 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-16 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Fish And Wildlife - Interstate Wildlife Violator Compact (would Adopt The Wildlife Violation Compact Act Which Recognizes Violations Of Hunting, Trapping And Fishing Laws Occurring In Other States As Violations In A Person's Home State.)
Title
An Act Relating To Fish And Wildlife - Interstate Wildlife Violator Compact (would Adopt The Wildlife Violation Compact Act Which Recognizes Violations Of Hunting, Trapping And Fishing Laws Occurring In Other States As Violations In A Person's Home State.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-16 | House | Signed by Governor |
2013-07-10 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2013-07-01 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (07/01/2013) |
2013-06-26 | House | House passed Sub A |
2013-06-25 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/26/2013) |
2013-06-24 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2013-06-22 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/24/2013) |
2013-04-11 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2013-04-09 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/11/2013) |
2013-03-29 | House | Committee transferred to House Environment and Natural Resources |
2013-02-28 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/HouseText13/H5764.pdf |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/HouseText13/H5764A.pdf |