RI H5849 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-20 - Committee postponed at request of sponsor (03/21/2019)
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-20 - Committee postponed at request of sponsor (03/21/2019)
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes shooting preserves of five hundred (500) acres or greater to allow hunting deer, elk, or other animals in addition to domestic game birds as regulated by the department of environmental management.
Title
Field Trials And Shooting Preserves
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-20 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (03/21/2019) |
2019-03-15 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2019-03-14 | House | Introduced, referred to House Environment and Natural Resources |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5849.pdf |