RI H5854 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Reduces the rate for sales and use taxes from seven percent (7%) to six and one-half percent (6.5%) upon passage of federal law or court decisions authorizing states to require remote sellers to collect or remit rate or sales taxes.
Title
Sales And Use Taxes--liability And Computation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-08 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-04-30 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/08/2019) |
2019-03-14 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5854.pdf |