RI H5893 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-29 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-29 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows DBHDDH to receive medical/mental health records in abuse, neglect, mistreatment, exploitation cases of elderly, disabled residents without a release.
Title
Confidentiality Of Health Care Communications And Information Act
Sponsors
Rep. Dennis Canario [D] | Rep. John Edwards [D] | Rep. Marvin Abney [D] | Rep. Samuel Azzinaro [D] |
Rep. David Bennett [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-29 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-04-10 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/29/2015) |
2015-03-13 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText15/HouseText15/H5893.pdf |