RI H5922 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Towns And Cities: would clarify provisions in chapter 45-9 - Budget Commissions, to address issues that have arisen in the administration of the chapter, including statutory provisions regarding indemnity.
Title
An Act Relating To Towns And Cities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-12 | Signed by Governor | |
2011-07-07 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-06-30 | Senate passed as amended in concurrence | |
2011-06-30 | Placed on Senate Calendar | |
2011-06-30 | House passed as amended (floor amendment) | |
2011-06-29 | Placed on House Calendar | |
2011-06-29 | Committee recommends passage | |
2011-06-29 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2011-06-16 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2011-06-16 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2011-03-09 | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://dirac.rilin.state.ri.us/BillStatus/WebClass1.ASP?WCI=BillStatus&WCE=ifrmBillStatus&WCU |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText11/HouseText11/H5922.pdf |