RI H5922 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-09 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-09 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Extends air quality monitoring requirements and data submission deadline by one year.
Title
The Permanent Air Quality Monitoring Act
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] | Rep. David Bennett [D] | Rep. Joseph Solomon [D] | Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-30 - Senate - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - House - Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - House - Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-09 | House | Signed by Governor |
2021-07-08 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/30/2021) |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/28/2021) |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2021-06-22 | House | House passed Sub A |
2021-06-18 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/22/2021) |
2021-06-17 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2021-06-11 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2021-06-11 | House | Scheduled for reconsideration (06/17/2021) |
2021-06-09 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2021-06-04 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/09/2021) |
2021-03-18 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-03-12 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/18/2021) |
2021-02-24 | House | Introduced, referred to House Environment and Natural Resources |