RI H5924 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Makes a change to the meaning of the words "knowing and "knowingly" in the state false claim act.
Title
The State False Claim Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-01 - House - Passage of amendment (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-04 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/04/2019) |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2019-05-01 | House | House read and passed |
2019-04-26 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/01/2019) |
2019-04-09 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2019-04-05 | House | Scheduled for consideration (04/09/2019) |
2019-04-03 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-29 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/03/2019) |
2019-03-28 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |