RI H5934 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 27 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 27 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Towns And Cities -- Privatization Of Municipal Services (would Establish A Process Governing The Privatization Of Municipal Services Analogous To Present Chapter 42-148 Governing The Privatization Of State Services.)
Title
An Act Relating To Towns And Cities -- Privatization Of Municipal Services (would Establish A Process Governing The Privatization Of Municipal Services Analogous To Present Chapter 42-148 Governing The Privatization Of State Services.)
Sponsors
Rep. John Carnevale [D] | Rep. John Desimone [D] | Rep. Raymond Hull [D] | Rep. William O'Brien [D] |
Rep. Scott Guthrie [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-25 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2013-04-18 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/25/2013) |
2013-03-27 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/HouseText13/H5934.pdf |