RI H5934 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-29 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-29 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires that if state employee unions are engaged in contract negotiations and/or utilizing the dispute resolution process, all terms and conditions in the collective bargaining agreement shall continue to remain in effect.
Title
Organization Of State Employees
Sponsors
Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] | Rep. David Morales [D] | Rep. Charlene Lima [D] | Rep. Patricia Serpa [D] |
Rep. Julie Casimiro [D] | Rep. Thomas Noret [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-29 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-03-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/29/2023) |
2023-03-01 | House | Introduced, referred to House Labor |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText23/HouseText23/H5934.pdf |