RI H5964 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on April 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-06 - Referred to Senate Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-06 - Referred to Senate Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for annual report on academic achievement of foster care youth.
Title
Curriculum
Sponsors
Rep. Julie Casimiro [D] | Rep. June Speakman [D] | Rep. Susan Donovan [D] | Rep. Justine Caldwell [D] |
Rep. Gregg Amore [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-29 - House - Passage (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-06 | Senate | Referred to Senate Education |
2019-05-29 | House | House passed Sub A |
2019-05-24 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/29/2019) |
2019-05-15 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2019-05-10 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2019-05-10 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/15/2019) |
2019-04-24 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-04-22 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/24/2019) |
2019-04-05 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |