RI H5975 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-18 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-18 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Expands the type of pharmaceuticals which may be prescribed using electronic prescriptions and would also provide for protection of patient privacy in regard to electronic prescriptions.
Title
Uniform Controlled Substances Act -- Electronic Prescription Of Controlled Substances
Sponsors
Rep. Mia Ackerman [D] | Rep. Julie Casimiro [D] | Rep. Alex Marszalkowski [D] | Rep. John Edwards [D] |
Rep. Susan Donovan [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-08 - House - Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-18 | House | Signed by Governor |
2017-07-13 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/30/2017) |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Committee voted to reconsider |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-06-09 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/13/2017) |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
2017-06-08 | House | House passed Sub A |
2017-06-02 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/08/2017) |
2017-05-24 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2017-05-19 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/24/2017) |
2017-04-12 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-04-07 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/12/2017) |
2017-03-22 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |