RI H5975 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on April 10 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Increases the penalties for a first offense of leaving the scene of an accident resulting in death to a minimum five (5) years in incarceration, a minimum of ten thousand dollars ($10,000) and a minimum license revocation of five (5) years.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Accidents And Accident Reports

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2019-04-26HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/30/2019)
2019-04-23HouseCommittee postponed at request of sponsor (04/23/2019)
2019-04-15HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration
2019-04-10HouseIntroduced, referred to House Judiciary

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback