RI H6002 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows Jessica L. Irey to join Katelyn T. Maxwell and Joseph M. Brennan in marriage on or about June 21, 2019, within the City of East Providence, Rhode Island.
Title
Relating To Solemnization Of Marriages
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Shekarchi [D] | Rep. Joseph Solomon [D] | Rep. David Bennett [D] | Rep. Thomas Noret [D] |
Rep. Jose Serodio [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-30 - House - Passage (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | House | Signed by Governor |
2019-06-05 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/05/2019) |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/21/2019) |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2019-04-30 | House | House read and passed |
2019-04-26 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (04/30/2019) |
2019-04-26 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2019-04-15 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/25/2019) |
2019-04-12 | House | Introduced, referred to House Special Legislation |