RI H6088 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on May 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-29 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-29 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Makes numerous changes to the merit system.
Title
Division Of Personnel Administration
Sponsors
Rep. Jason Knight [D] | Rep. Anastasia Williams [D] | Rep. June Speakman [D] | Rep. Stephen Ucci [D] |
Rep. Robert Craven [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-05-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/29/2019) |
2019-05-21 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (05/22/2019) |
2019-05-20 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2019-05-09 | House | Introduced, referred to House Labor |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H6088.pdf |