RI H6210 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 27 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-28 - Referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture
Pending: Senate Environment and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 27 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-28 - Referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture
Pending: Senate Environment and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows DEM to extend certain deadlines for required sewer construction in the replacement of cesspools, which deadlines would not extend beyond January 1, 2025.
Title
The Rhode Island Cesspool Act Of 2007
Sponsors
Rep. John Edwards [D] | Rep. Dennis Canario [D] | Rep. David Bennett [D] | Rep. Brian Kennedy [D] |
Rep. Joseph Shekarchi [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-27 - House - Passage (Y: 71 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-28 | Senate | Referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture |
2019-06-27 | House | House read and passed |
2019-06-26 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/27/2019) |
2019-06-26 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2019-06-24 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/26/2019) |
2019-06-24 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-06-21 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/24/2019) |
2019-06-12 | House | Introduced, referred to House Environment and Natural Resources |