RI H6215 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes building inspectors to affix their signatures to permits that pertain to work they inspect.
Title
State Building Code
Sponsors
Rep. James Jackson [D] | Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] | Rep. Gregory Costantino [D] | Rep. Charlene Lima [D] |
Rep. James McLaughlin [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-26 - House - Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-15 | House | Signed by Governor |
2019-07-11 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/28/2019) |
2019-06-26 | House | House read and passed |
2019-06-24 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/26/2019) |
2019-06-24 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2019-06-21 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/24/2019) |
2019-06-18 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-06-14 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/18/2019) |
2019-06-13 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |