RI H7017 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
PUBLIC UTILITIES AND CARRIERS -- PUBLIC UTILITIES COMMISSION - Directs PUC to extend utility termination moratorium for gas/electricity from April 15 to May 1, of each year with discretion to respond to emergency/ economic conditions/customers' needs.
Title
Directs PUC to extend utility termination moratorium for gas/electricity from April 15 to May 1, of each year with discretion to respond to emergency/ economic conditions/customers' needs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-29 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/02/2024) |
2024-01-05 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H7017.pdf |