RI H7058 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-01 - Referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs
Pending: Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-01 - Referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs
Pending: Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
LABOR AND LABOR RELATIONS -- POSTING OF VETERANS' BENEFITS AND SERVICES - Requires employers in the state with more than 50 employees to display a poster containing basic information on veterans' benefits and services be created and distributed by the DLT in consultation with the office of veterans services.
Title
Requires employers in the state with more than 50 employees to display a poster containing basic information on veterans' benefits and services be created and distributed by the DLT in consultation with the office of veterans services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-29 - House - Passage (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - House - House Committee on Labor: Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - House - House Committee on Labor: Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |
2024-02-29 | House | House read and passed |
2024-02-23 | House | Placed on House Calendar (02/29/2024) |
2024-02-14 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2024-02-09 | House | Scheduled for consideration (02/14/2024) |
2024-02-01 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-01-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/01/2024) |
2024-01-05 | House | Introduced, referred to House Labor |