RI H7062 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-01 - Referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government
Pending: Senate Housing and Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-01 - Referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government
Pending: Senate Housing and Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
TOWNS AND CITIES -- ZONING ORDINANCES - Amends several sections of law relating to zoning ordinances to provide uniform zoning standards for accessory dwelling units.
Title
Amends several sections of law relating to zoning ordinances to provide uniform zoning standards for accessory dwelling units.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-14 - House - Passage (Y: 55 N: 9 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - House - Passage Of Amendment (Y: 8 N: 54 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-02-14 - House - Passage Of Amendment (Y: 10 N: 52 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-02-01 - House - House Committee on Municipal Government & Housing: Passage (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - House - Passage Of Amendment (Y: 8 N: 54 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-02-14 - House - Passage Of Amendment (Y: 10 N: 52 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-02-01 - House - House Committee on Municipal Government & Housing: Passage (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |
2024-02-14 | House | House read and passed |
2024-02-09 | House | Placed on House Calendar (02/14/2024) |
2024-02-01 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2024-01-26 | House | Scheduled for consideration (02/01/2024) |
2024-01-25 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-01-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/25/2024) |
2024-01-05 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government & Housing |