RI H7080 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes a city or town clerk/recorder of deeds, at the clerk's/recorder's option, to accept electronic documents for recording real property and land records and to index and store those documents.
Title
Electronic Recording
Sponsors
Rep. Deborah Ruggiero [D] | Rep. Julie Casimiro [D] | Rep. Robert Phillips [D] | Rep. Katherine Kazarian [D] |
Rep. Gregg Amore [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-23 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-29 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2018-06-27 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2018-06-23 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2018-06-23 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/23/2018) |
2018-06-23 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2018-06-23 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/23/2018) |
2018-06-23 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/21/2018) |
2018-06-19 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2018-06-15 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/19/2018) |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2018-03-06 | House | House read and passed |
2018-03-02 | House | Placed on House Calendar (03/06/2018) |
2018-02-13 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2018-02-09 | House | Scheduled for consideration (02/13/2018) |
2018-01-24 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-01-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/24/2018) |
2018-01-12 | House | Committee transferred to House Judiciary |
2018-01-10 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |