RI H7105 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-14 - Senate passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-14 - Senate passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Making Revised Appropriations For The Support Of The State For The Fiscal Year Ending June 30, 2010
Title
An Act Making Revised Appropriations For The Support Of The State For The Fiscal Year Ending June 30, 2010
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-14 | Senate passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) | |
2010-04-14 | Placed on Senate Calendar | |
2010-04-14 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A as amended in concurrence | |
2010-04-14 | Referred to Senate Finance | |
2010-04-14 | Scheduled to be heard and /or considered in anticipation of House passage | |
2010-04-13 | House passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) | |
2010-04-08 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A | |
2010-04-08 | Placed on House Calendar | |
2010-04-08 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-01-13 | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText10/HouseText10/H7105.pdf |